|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 979, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5345.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 5107.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Set for hearing August 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4917.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5930.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 885.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 685.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|