California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB233 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill June 16, 2022
Bill March 1, 2021