|
10/05/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 538, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2554.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 11. Page 2912.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1329.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1184.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 456.) (March 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Set for hearing March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|