California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB242 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2021

Amended

Bill August 30, 2021
Bill August 16, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021