|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 917, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5341.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5997.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2022
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2801.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
From inactive file on motion of Senator Hertzberg.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Stern.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1186.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
March 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 667.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Set for hearing March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|