California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB291 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill August 18, 2022
Bill June 20, 2022
Bill May 20, 2021