Assembly
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2829.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2794.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Set for hearing January 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
January 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Set for hearing January 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2753.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
Set for hearing January 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
April 27 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
March 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|