LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB3
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB3
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB3
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 7, 2020
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 20, 2022
Compare
Bill
May 10, 2022
Compare
Bill
January 20, 2022
Compare
Bill
January 3, 2022
Compare
Bill
April 27, 2021
Compare