|
09/24/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 298, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2547.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 2883.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1236.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 859.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
April 13 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 634.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|