California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB334 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2021

Amended

Bill September 2, 2021
Bill June 28, 2021
Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021