Senate
|
09/29/2022
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/29/2022
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 5277.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 1255.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1188.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 518.) (March 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Set for hearing March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|