California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB346 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Amended

Bill August 24, 2022
Bill August 15, 2022
Bill June 23, 2022
Bill June 15, 2022
Bill June 21, 2021