|
10/08/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 676, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 2353.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 5. Page 2594.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 2. Page 1108.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1019.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2021
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 793.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
March 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Set for hearing March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|