California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB363 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2021

Amended

Bill July 14, 2021
Bill June 14, 2021
Bill May 11, 2021
Bill April 5, 2021