Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/06/2021
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/06/2021
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2603.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1278.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1189.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2021
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
May 10 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
May 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 605.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|