|
08/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 218, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5826.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1060.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 704.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 668.) (March 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Set for hearing March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|