California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB367 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2022

Chaptered

Bill August 29, 2022

Amended

Bill April 12, 2021
Bill March 23, 2021
Bill March 2, 2021