|
10/06/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 602, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2517.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 2689.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1331.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1189.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 533.) (March 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Set for hearing March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|