California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB368 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2021

Amended

Bill July 15, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021