Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2021
|
July 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1350.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1190.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 704.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|