California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB402 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2021

Amended

Bill June 14, 2021
Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021
Bill March 7, 2021