|
10/09/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 766, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2376.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2715.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2021
|
July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1283.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1190.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 793.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 592.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|