California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB416 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2021

Amended

Bill August 30, 2021
Bill June 16, 2021
Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 22, 2021