Senate | 02/03/2022 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2021 | April 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2021 | Set for hearing April 7. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2021 | Set for hearing March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |