|
07/23/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2308.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1005.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|