California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB427 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill July 14, 2021

Chaptered

Bill July 23, 2021

Amended

Bill April 12, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021