Assembly | 06/17/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2021 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2021 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1034.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2021 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 605.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Set for hearing March 24. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |