Senate
|
09/28/2022
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2022
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 5389.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2022
|
June 13 hearing: Heard for testimony only.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1232.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1192.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 843.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|