California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB457 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2022

Amended

Bill August 25, 2022
Bill June 21, 2022
Bill May 26, 2022