Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Pan.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1192.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 795.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
April 21 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 589.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S., HEALTH, and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|