Assembly | 06/21/2021 | June 23 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2021 | June 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2021 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1109.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2021 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1044.) (May 6). | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |