Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 860.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 671.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|