Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2378.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 7. Page 2734.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (July 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1232.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1195.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2021
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 956.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 670.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
March 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|