California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB524 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Amended

Bill August 30, 2021
Bill July 7, 2021
Bill June 28, 2021
Bill June 14, 2021
Bill May 3, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021
Bill March 11, 2021