|
10/04/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 491, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2380.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2719.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2021
|
June 30 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1037.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 840.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 670.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|