California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB534 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2021

Amended

Bill August 30, 2021
Bill April 29, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021
Bill March 4, 2021