|
10/08/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 730, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2277.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2524.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 533.) (March 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Set for hearing March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|