California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB541 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2021

Amended

Bill June 2, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021