|
09/30/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 428, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2612.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3018.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1235.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2021
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 942.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|