California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB570 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2021

Amended

Bill September 1, 2021
Bill June 23, 2021
Bill April 29, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021