|
09/27/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 335, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2280.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 6. Page 2566.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1057.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 860.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 671.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|