California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB572 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2021

Amended

Bill July 6, 2021
Bill June 17, 2021