|
04/28/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3473.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Urgency clause adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4216.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 3). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1093.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 876.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
April 7 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|