California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB577 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 28, 2022

Amended

Bill January 12, 2022
Bill April 7, 2021
Bill March 7, 2021