Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2823.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2795.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Set for hearing January 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
January 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Set for hearing January 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2753.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
Set for hearing January 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|