Senate | 02/01/2022 | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2021 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Hueso. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1197.) (May 20). | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Set for hearing May 3. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 780.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Set for hearing April 13. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |