|
07/16/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 107, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1801.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2091.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1035.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 915.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|