California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB590 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill July 16, 2021

Amended

Bill June 17, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021