|
09/28/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2213.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2472.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1059.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 987.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2021
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 860.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
April 13 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD., HOUSING, and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|