California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB591 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2021

Amended

Bill June 10, 2021
Bill May 3, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021
Bill April 5, 2021